WebFeb 24, 2024 · Keppel Corp’s non-executive chairman Dr Lee Boon Yang will retire from the company with April 23 2024, right after its upcoming annual general meeting. Danny …
Keppel Offshore & Marine to exit rig-building business, shifts to ...
WebFeb 2, 2024 · As I said in my article, Lee Boon Yang, a former PAP Minister, is still Chairman of Keppel Corp as well as of Singapore Press Holdings. Like most companies in Singapore the influence of the PAP is much greater … Keppel Corporation (also known as Keppel Corp) is a Singaporean conglomerate headquartered in Keppel Bay Tower, HarbourFront. The company consists of several affiliated businesses that specialises in property, infrastructure and asset management businesses. The company was founded in 1968 as Keppel Shipyard at the Keppel Harbour smsc bouygues telecom
Keppel Capital
WebFormer Chairman of Asia, Schlumberger. Chan Hon Chew. Chief Financial Officer of Keppel Corporation Limited. Tham Sai Choy. Chairman of EM Services Pte Ltd; Non-Executive and Independent Director of Keppel Corporation Limited; Former Chairman of KPMG Asia Pacific. Chua Hsien Yang . Director of Group Mergers & Acquisitions (M&A) … WebLee was appointed Chairman of the Board of Keppel Corporation in 2009, after resigning from the Cabinet, where he served until 2024. He also served as Chairman of Singapore … WebChairman of Keppel Corporation Limited with effect from 23 April 2024. Appointed to the Board on 1 October 2010 (Date of last re-election: 2 June 2024), Mr Danny Teoh is a non-executive and non-independent director. … r kelly girls living with him